Bock, LLC v. Steelman et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Bock, LLC
Defendant: Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust, Trustee of Suzanne T. Steelman Irrevocable Trust, Maryann Steelman, Trustees of ABC Trusts, Trustee of Stephen P. Steelman Irrevocable Trust, Paul Steelman, Trustee of Paul C. Steelman and Maryann T. Steelman Revocable Living Trust, Suzanne Steelman Taylor and Stephen Steelman
Case Number: 2:2019cv01065
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01065-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernest Bock, LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued,. Maryann Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Maryann Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Stephen Steelman served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Suzanne Steelman Taylor served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(Gormley, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan M. Labov for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Palladino for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan M. Labov and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611404) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Palladino and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611393) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maryann Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Paul Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Stephen Steelman, and Suzanne Steelman Taylor re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Gormley, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ernest Bock, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Tom Bock for Ernest Bock, LLC added. (Gormley, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5597349) by Ernest Bock, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gormley, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bock, LLC v. Steelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of Suzanne T. Steelman Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Steelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of ABC Trusts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of Stephen P. Steelman Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Steelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of Paul C. Steelman and Maryann T. Steelman Revocable Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Steelman Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Steelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Bock, LLC
Represented By: David Larson
Represented By: Ryan T. Gormley
Represented By: John Palladino
Represented By: Evan Labov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?