Sherwood v. Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC
Plaintiff: Kalena Sherwood
Defendant: Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01068
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01068-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (AF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Set Aside by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #14 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Motions due by 1/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/26/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC (Aquino, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Set Aside by Plaintiff Kalena Sherwood. Replies due by 7/29/2019. (Nelson, Sharon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Kalena Sherwood. (Nelson, Sharon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION to Strike #4 Answer to Petition for Removal and #8 MOTION to Set Aside: Motions Hearing set for 8/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Strike by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Set Aside Default Entered in State Court by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. (Aquino, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kalena Sherwood. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nelson, Sharon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #4 Answer to Petition for Removal, by Plaintiff Kalena Sherwood. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Nelson, Sharon)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/12/2019.(Aquino, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BR Chicken Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent 77 Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent BR Chicken, LLC for Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC added. (Aquino, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/21/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/6/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 21, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794248-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5597665) by Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kichline, Kelly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherwood v. Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalena Sherwood
Represented By: Sharon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ribbon Fried Chicken Grand Bazaar, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Aquino
Represented By: Kelly R Kichline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?