Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv01082
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena; filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fieser, #2 Declaration Lansky, #3 Declaration Pasquale, #4 Declaration Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jeremy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/24/2019) (JM).
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
June 24, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5598033) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?