Pepaj et al v. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein, Rachel Koren, Lucy Pinder, Eva Pepaj and Tiffany Toth Gray
Defendant: Granite Gaming Group II, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01088
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to File Answer to Complaint by Defendant Granite Gaming Group II, LLC. (Bragonje, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC answer due 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant Granite Gaming Group II, LLC. (Bragonje, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to File it's Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Granite Gaming Group II, LLC. (Bragonje, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Pepaj, Rachel Bernstein, Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Toth Gray re #4 Summons Issued. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service)(Sexton, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Granite Gaming Group II, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rachel Bernstein, Tiffany Toth Gray, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sexton, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Granite Gaming Group II, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5598812) by Eva Pepaj, Rachel Bernstein, Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Toth Gray. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons)(Bonds, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepaj et al v. Granite Gaming Group II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Gaming Group II, LLC
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?