Briggs v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shelene Irene Briggs
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01094
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harvey P. Sackett and approving Attorney Hal Taylor as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 22, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM to #3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Shelene Irene Briggs. (Taylor, Hal)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harvey P. Sackett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5599806) by Plaintiff Shelene Irene Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shelene Irene Briggs. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shelene Irene Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons AG, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons US Atty) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelene Irene Briggs
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Harvey P. Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?