Kaufmann v. Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Plaintiff: Heather Kaufmann
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corporation and Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01102
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case for Early Neutral Evaluation. (no image attached) (AF)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Venetian Casino Resort, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Las Vegas Sands Corp., Corporate Parent Las Vegas Sands, LLC for Venetian Casino Resort, LLC added. (Arechederra Hall, Veronica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/16/2019.(Arechederra Hall, Veronica) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Venetian Casino Resort, LLC answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Correct Party and Amend Caption; Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corporation. (Arechederra Hall, Veronica) Modified on 7/16/2019 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Name Correct Party and Amend Caption by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corporation. (Arechederra Hall, Veronica) Modified on 7/16/2019 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Heather Kaufmann. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Foley, Jenny)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as the case number is deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the case number to 2:19-cv-01102-APG-BNW and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #5 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 VIEW #7 corrected image re SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Kaufmann re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Las Vegas Sands Corporation served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
June 26, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Las Vegas Sands Corporation. (JM)
June 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Heather Kaufmann. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Las Vegas Sands Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5600993) by Heather Kaufmann. Proof of service due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufmann v. Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Represented By: Veronica Arechederra Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kaufmann
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?