Watson v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc
Plaintiff: Zella Watson
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01110
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Zella Watson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jacob)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER re #7 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/23/2019. Motions due by 1/21/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #7 , #6 . Documents are not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as the case number is deficient. All further filings should contain the case number as 2:19-cv-01110-JAD-BNW. No further action is required to documents #7 , #6 at this time. Counsel is advised to file documents pursuant to this court's Local Rules. (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc Stipulated (Lowry, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. (Lowry, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. (Lowry, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/26/2019. By Deputy Clerk: D. Johnson. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/11/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/10/2019.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794746-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5602048) by Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zella Watson
Represented By: Breanna K. Hartmann
Represented By: Jacob S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan C. Pattillo
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?