Higgins et al v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Russel K Higgins, Tammy Higgins and Russell Kent Higgins
Defendant: Hazel Trucking, LLC and Gustavo Wilson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01145
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF Nos. #15 and #16 were not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incomplete case number on documents. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-01145-APG-BNW. Attorney Marsha Stephenson is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning these documents at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gustavo Wilson that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Armando Rivera for Gustavo Wilson added. (Stephenson, Marsha)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re #11 Amended Petition for Removal filed by Hazel Trucking, LLC, Gustavo Wilson. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/5/2019.(Stephenson, Marsha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 8/21/2019 to reflect correct docket entry relationship (MMM).
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Russell Kent Higgins, Tammy Higgins. (Silva, Gregorio)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #8 the order to show cause is deemed satisfied, and I will not remand to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #8 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Hazel Trucking, LLC.. (Stephenson, Marsha) Modified on 8/2/2019 to reflect correct docket entry relationships (MMM).
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-19-796025-C, by Hazel Trucking, LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Stephenson, Marsha)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Removed Action by Defendant Hazel Trucking, LLC. (Stephenson, Marsha)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT/Index of Pleadings From State Court Action re #3 Petition for Removal and re #8 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Hazel Trucking, LLC. (Stephenson, Marsha)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 8, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , #5 . Attorney Jamie Scott Hendrickson is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/18/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hazel Trucking, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stephenson, Marsha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hazel Trucking, LLC. (Stephenson, Marsha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-19-796025-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5611552) by Hazel Trucking, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Marsha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding violation of the Federal and Local Rules and Attorney Action Required to document #1 : ERROR: Filing fee not paid and wrong event selected by Marsha L. Stephenson. CORRECTION: Attorney Marsha L. Stephenson is advised to file the pleading using the correct Petition for Removal event in accordance with 28 U.S. Code 1446 and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, after the Petition if entered, then a Statement re: Removal and a Certificate of Interested Parties are to be filed as separate entries in accordance with the local rules regarding electronic filing. Attorney is also advised to pay the required filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1914. Attorney is advised until such time as the filing fee is paid no Judges will be assigned. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 ERROR: Filing fee not paid and wrong event selected by attorney Marsha L. Stephenson. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document #1 using the correct event pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and pay the required filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1914 (a). STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hazel Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Certificate of Interested Parties)(Stephenson, Marsha) Document #1 terminated as filed in error on 7/2/2019 (RFJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins et al v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel K Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Higgins
Represented By: Rahul Ravipudi
Represented By: Gregorio Vincent Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Kent Higgins
Represented By: Rahul Ravipudi
Represented By: Gregorio Vincent Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Marsha L. Stephenson
Represented By: Jamie Scott Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Wilson
Represented By: Marsha L. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?