Thompson v. Lamplight Village @ Centennial Springs Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Carl Thompson
Defendant: Lamplight Village @ Centennial Springs Homeowners' Association
Garnishee: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01152
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff Carl Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Smith, Abraham)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion for Judgment by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Leland)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Backus, Shea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #14 Response, filed by Plaintiff Carl Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Smith, Abraham)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion for Judgment by Plaintiff Carl Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Smith, Abraham)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #14 Response by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Backus, Shea)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 VIEW Corrected Image #15 as to RESPONSE to #13 Response, #9 Motion for Judgment by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Shea) Modified on 8/2/2019 (RFJ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Motion for Judgment by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Shea)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Carl Thompson. Responses due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Smith, Abraham)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Shea)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carl Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Muije, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment; filed by Plaintiff Carl Thompson. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Muije, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Garnishee QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Leland)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John W Muije on behalf of Plaintiff Carl Thompson. Notice of Appearance (Muije, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 . The document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as to the case number being deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the case number to 2:19-cv-01152-JCM-VCF and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #5 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John W Muije on behalf of Plaintiff Carl Thompson. (Muije, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE; filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Backus, Shea)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/2/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/17/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by QBE Insurance Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Limited for QBE Insurance Corporation added. (Backus, Leland)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-14-697699-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5609742) by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Backus, Leland) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Lamplight Village @ Centennial Springs Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Thompson
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Samuel A. Harding
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Represented By: Matthew S Granda
Represented By: Albert N Lasso
Represented By: Evan K. Simonsen
Represented By: John W Muije
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamplight Village @ Centennial Springs Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Shea A. Backus
Represented By: Leland E. Backus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?