Lopez-Herrera v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Maria Lopez-Herrera
Respondent: Sandra D. Anderson, Kevin K. McAleenan and Hon William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv01153
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents and against Petitioner. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #3 Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera's Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #5 The order granting temporary relief is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #8 the respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #1 the petition is DISMISSED without prejudice as unexhausted. The clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/12/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/2019. RE: #12 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) and de minimus untimely filing re #11 Reply by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to #3 Motion for TRO, by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24)(Ramsey, Brian) Modified docket entry relationship on 7/22/2019 (DKJ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 20 & 21 to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to William Barr re #4 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 Motion for TRO, by Respondents Sandra D. Anderson, William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Smith, Brianna)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. William Barr served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (JQC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #5 Order, filed by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VACATED per #14 Order. (ADR) ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. IT IS ORDERED that removal proceedings regarding Maria Lopez-Herrera shall be STAYED, and the respondents shall not deport or otherwise remove Ms. Lopez-Herrera pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lopez-Herrera's counsel shall serve the respondents with a copy of the emergency motion and this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the respondents shall file a response to #3 Lopez-Herrera's emergency motion to stay removal proceedings on or before noon on Friday, 7/12/2019. Petitioner shall file any reply on or before noon on Friday, 7/19/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order, by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian Ramsey, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 20 Case Plan) (Ramsey, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipts 7017 3380 0000 4606 0207 and 7017 3380 0000 4606 0191 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order. (MR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Temporary Injunction is denied. Clerk shall serve copies of petition and this order (see order for details). FURTHER ORDERED that the respondents shall file and serve an answer or other response to the petition (ECF No. 1) within 20 days from the date of service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: pursuant to order - JM) Modified to include distribution on 7/3/2019 (JM).
July 3, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5610028) by Maria Deltransito Lopez-Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vol I, Exhibits 1-12, #2 Exhibit Vol II, Exhibits 13-15, #3 Exhibit Vol III, Exhibits 16-19, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Ramsey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Herrera v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandra D. Anderson
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hon William Barr
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Lopez-Herrera
Represented By: Brian J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?