U.S. Bank National Association v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01154
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
3 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01154-RFB-EJY. (no image attached) (RFJ)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/27/2019. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,,. North American Title Insurance Company served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Home Corporation, Other Affiliate Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Other Affiliate LFS Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Aronson, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by North American Title Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/26/2019.(Aronson, Elizabeth) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01154-GMN-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 3, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to North American Title Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
July 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5610072) by U.S. Bank National Association. Proof of service due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Summons)(Robbins, Lindsay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Matthew S Carter
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?