Laszloffy v. Garcia
Plaintiff: John Laszloffy
Defendant: Cindy Zoraida Garcia
Case Number: 2:2019cv01173
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Plaintiff John Laszloffy. (Attachments: #1 cover letter) (ADR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiff John Laszloffy. (JM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Laszloffy. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Cover Letter) (MR) Modified on 7/8/2019 to restrict access to #1 -2 per LR IC 6-1 (MR).
July 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laszloffy v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laszloffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Zoraida Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?