Blackman v. Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr.
Defendant: Paris Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC and Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01192
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. (Planet, Brandi)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01192-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #11 Motion by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Tennert, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Tennert, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #9 Motion, #8 Motion for Writ of Mandamus by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Tennert, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. (Tennert, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. (Tennert, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01192-APG-CWH. (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2019. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION Ordering Respondent to Cease and Desist by Plaintiff Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (JM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr. Replies due by 7/29/2019. (JM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Certiorari Judicial Review by Plaintiff Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (JM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus to Compel by Plaintiff Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr. (JM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Injunction by Plaintiff Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (JM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 7/30/2019. (Tennert, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Margaret Byrd re #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.. (Tennert, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/25/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paris Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Corporate Parent Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent Caesars Resort Collection, LLC, Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprises Holdings LP for Paris Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC added. (Tennert, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-19-796776-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5616907) by Paris Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tennert, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackman v. Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Karl Blackman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paris Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: John D. Tennert
Represented By: Brandi M. Planet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Tennert
Represented By: Brandi M. Planet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?