Bulwark Exterminating, LLC v. Fine et al
Plaintiff: Bulwark Exterminating, LLC
Defendant: Tevita T. Fine and Fine Exterminating, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01216
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bulwark Exterminating, LLC re #1 Complaint,,. Fine Exterminating, LLC served on 7/14/2019, answer due 8/4/2019. (Kotchka-Alanes, Malani)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bulwark Exterminating, LLC re #1 Complaint,,. Tevita T. Fine served on 7/14/2019, answer due 8/4/2019. (Kotchka-Alanes, Malani)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Bruce E. Samuels to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/26/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bulwark Exterminating, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kotchka-Alanes, Malani)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5620761) by Bulwark Exterminating, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Kotchka-Alanes, Malani) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulwark Exterminating, LLC v. Fine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bulwark Exterminating, LLC
Represented By: Malani Dale Kotchka-Alanes
Represented By: Bruce E. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tevita T. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Exterminating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?