Fischer v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Fischer
Defendant: Home Depot
Case Number: 2:2019cv01228
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Home Depot. (Rivera, Lynn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Home Depot. (Rivera, Lynn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Home Depot. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (JM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/15/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/30/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-797042-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5623415) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Petition for Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Petition for Removal of Action, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Petition for Removal of Action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration Declaration of Lynn V. Rivera in support of Petition for Removal of Action, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lynn V. Rivera in support of Petition for Removal of Action, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lynn V. Rivera in support of Petition for Removal of Action, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lynn V. Rivera in support of Petition for Removal of Action, #9 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings, #10 Certification of Interested Parties)(Rivera, Lynn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot
Represented By: Lynn V. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Fischer
Represented By: David J. Winterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?