Meggs v. Midjit Market, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Defendant: Midjit Market, Inc., a Nevada corporation and Midjit Market, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01246
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Midjit Market, Inc. answer due 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Midjit Market, Inc.. (Tran, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Meggs re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued. Midjit Market, Inc. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Spretnak, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Midjit Market, Inc.'s answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Midjit Market, Inc.. (Garin, Joseph)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph P Garin on behalf of Defendant Midjit Market, Inc.. (Garin, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lawrence Arthur Fuller and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert P. Spretnak. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence Arthur Fuller and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert P. Spretnak (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5630971) by Plaintiff John Meggs. (Spretnak, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lawrence Arthur Fuller to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/2/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Midjit Market, Inc. (JM)
July 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Meggs. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Spretnak, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midjit Market, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5627485) by John Meggs. Proof of service due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Spretnak, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meggs v. Midjit Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Represented By: Robert P Spretnak
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midjit Market, Inc., a Nevada corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midjit Market, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: Eric Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?