Cleveland v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Cleveland
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and George Ervin Purdue
Case Number: 2:2019cv01255
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Timothy Cleveland. No changes to parties. (MR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Timothy Cleveland. (MR)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to file Plaintiff's complaint on the docket. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ervin Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?