Geiger v. Arstrat, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Geiger
Defendant: Arstrat, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01286
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Arstrat, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Knecht, Adam)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Arstrat, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/1/2019.(Knecht, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arstrat, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gregory Geiger. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5637877) by Gregory Geiger. Proof of service due by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Arstrat)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger v. Arstrat, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arstrat, LLC
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Geiger
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?