Sporea et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Dionisie Razvan Sporea and Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea
Defendant: Al Gallman, Jeanne M. Kent, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01383
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re 120 days Status Request per LR IA 7-1(a) by Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea, Dionisie Razvan Sporea re #9 Response, #11 Notice (Other), #10 Reply, #8 Motion to Dismiss. (Darbinian, Anna)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re Status Request as to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea, Dionisie Razvan Sporea (Darbinian, Anna)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Al Gallman, Jeanne M. Kent, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America. (Addington, Gregory)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea, Dionisie Razvan Sporea. Replies due by 11/8/2019. (Darbinian, Anna)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Al Gallman, Jeanne M. Kent, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America. Responses due by 11/1/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/2/2019. (Addington, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anna Darbinian and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian Smith. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anna Darbinian and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian J. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5712040) by Plaintiffs Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea, Dionisie Razvan Sporea. (Smith, Brian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Anna Darbinian to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/27/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ADR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea, Dionisie Razvan Sporea. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (ADR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Dionisie Razvan Sporea, Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea. Proof of service due by 11/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope, #5 Receipt No. NVLAS065401)(ADR)
August 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sporea et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Gallman
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Kent
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionisie Razvan Sporea
Represented By: Brian James Smith
Represented By: Anna Darbinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skai Nicole Peed-Sporea
Represented By: Brian James Smith
Represented By: Anna Darbinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?