Angulo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Amoree Angulo
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01398
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Remand, Dismissal of Extra-Contractual Claims with Prejudice, and Cap on Damages at the $50,000 Amount of the UIM Coverage Limit. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court - ADR)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for CAP on Damages; filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clayton, Riley)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal; filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clayton, Riley)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Remand; filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clayton, Riley)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amoree Angulo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Miller, Danielle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Amoree Angulo. Responses due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Policy Limits Demand to AAA Insurance, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 AAA Policy Limits Offer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 State Farm Confirmation of Coverage, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 UIM Policy Limits Demand to State Farm, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 State Farm Settlement Offer) (Miller, Danielle)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clayton, Riley)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-797741-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5664430) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clayton, Riley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angulo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Riley A. Clayton
Represented By: James Barrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoree Angulo
Represented By: Gina M. Corena
Represented By: Danielle Colette Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?