Freeman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Freeman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01420
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER re #8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/11/2020. Motions due by 4/10/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff James Freeman (King, Amber)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Joslyn, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Joslyn, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1 Petition for Removal : Incorrect event selected by Attorney. Court modified the entry to reflect the correct event. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/16/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/31/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Stores, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Joslyn, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-796497-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5668117) by Walmart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Joslyn, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-796497-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5668075) by Walmart Stores, Inc. (Joslyn, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 8/19/2019 to reflect correct event (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Freeman
Represented By: Ronaldo Bumbasi
Represented By: Scott Poisson
Represented By: Amber N. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Daniel E. Joslyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?