Mora v. Tomasulo
Plaintiff: Bertha Mora
Defendant: Joseph John Tomasulo
Case Number: 2:2019cv01423
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/11/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order #8 is DENIED without prejudice for failure to articulate the reasons the parties request special scheduling review under LR 26-1(a). The parties must meet and confer and file an amended proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by 10/18/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Gesmundo, Emily)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Bertha Mora. (Ruiz, Lawrence)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bertha Mora. (Ruiz, Lawrence)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Joseph John Tomasulo. (Finch, Renee)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bertha Mora. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ruiz, Lawrence)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Joseph John Tomasulo. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/3/2019.(Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph John Tomasulo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Finch, Renee)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-797013-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5668648) by Joseph John Tomasulo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. Tomasulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Mora
Represented By: Lawrence M. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph John Tomasulo
Represented By: Christina Mae Mamer
Represented By: Michael Caleb Meyer
Represented By: Renee M Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?