Barriga v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eileen Barriga and Eliana Barriga
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01426
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/4/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Sever, #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Sever, #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eileen Barriga. Replies due by 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Titolo, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Sever /Bifurcate and to Stay Claims for Bad Faith by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/5/2019. (Carlson, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/5/2019. (Carlson, Jonathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eileen Barriga. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Titolo, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CSAA General Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent American Automobile Association (AAA) National Federation for CSAA General Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-798406-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5669076) by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barriga v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Barriga
Represented By: Timothy Titolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana Barriga
Represented By: Timothy Titolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?