Reed v. Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas
Plaintiff: Kelvin L Reed
Defendant: Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01434
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to #14 Defendant's Request for Exception Pertaining to ENE Conference Dated 11/14/2019 must be filed on or before 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Appearance by Telephone re #13 ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation, filed by Defendant Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. Responses due by 10/28/2019. (Thome, Sheri)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 First Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation continued to 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The confidential statement is due 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/9/2020. Motions due by 4/8/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE re #8 ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation Session, fled by Defendant Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. (Thome, Sheri)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. (Thome, Sheri)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kelvin L Reed. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (SLD)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach's chambers, not later than 4:00 p.m on 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thome, Sheri)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/24/2019.(Thome, Sheri) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint and #3 Summons Issued. Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (SLD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas. (SLD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas (Filing fee $400) by Kelvin L Reed. Proof of service due by 11/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt #NVLAS065515)(SLD)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Academy of Science Las Vegas
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin L Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?