Coniglio v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosalie Coniglio
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01435
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rosalie Coniglio. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hansen, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2019. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to do so. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than October 7, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JH)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER re #8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/25/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Busby, Jerry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Busby, Jerry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796179-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5670036) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coniglio v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Represented By: Gregory A Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Represented By: Gregory A Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Coniglio
Represented By: Amy M. Wilson
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?