Keith-Henderson v. Clark County School District
Plaintiff: Tammie Keith-Henderson
Defendant: Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01448
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss, #10 Stipulation by Defendant Clark County School District. (Herrera, Crystal)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 10/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: Dan M. Winder, Esq.; Plaintiff Tammie Keith-Henderson; Def Counsel: Crystal J. Herrera, Esq.; Def. Rep. Eileen Wheelan; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM - 11:45 AM; (no image attached) The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel; however, a settlement agreement was not reached. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case returns to the normal litigation track.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Tammie Keith-Henderson. Replies due by 10/18/2019.(Winder, Dan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Tammie Keith-Henderson. (Winder, Dan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Herrera, Crystal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Clark County School District. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019. (Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to my chambers, U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, in a sealed envelope- MARKED CONFIDENTIAL AND DO NOT FILE, not later than 4:00 p.m., 10/8/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Clark County School District answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Clark County School District. (Herrera, Crystal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tammie Keith-Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Winder, Dan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clark County School District re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Clark County School District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5672093) by Tammie Keith-Henderson. Proof of service due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Winder, Dan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith-Henderson v. Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Keith-Henderson
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?