Haskin v. University of Nevada Las Vegas
Plaintiff: Christine Haskin
Defendant: University of Nevada Las Vegas and State of Nevada ex. el. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv01449
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against University of Nevada Las Vegas by Christine Haskin. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Trenchak, Philip)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Haskin re #3 Summons Issued. University of Nevada Las Vegas served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Trenchak, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #7 and #8 Proposed Summonses. Summonses list non-defendants in case and will not be issued as submitted. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons not issued. Lists non-defendant. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Christine Haskin. (Trenchak, Philip)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons not issued. Lists non-defendant. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Christine Haskin. (Trenchak, Philip)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christine Haskin. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Trenchak, Philip)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Victoria Mullins and Philip Trenchak are advised to review and update user account information. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2019. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than August 26, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University of Nevada Las Vegas re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Nevada Las Vegas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5671956) by Christine Haskin. Proof of service due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trenchak, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskin v. University of Nevada Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nevada Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex. el. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Haskin
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Victoria Mullins
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?