Berry et al v. Lippincott Van Lines et al
Plaintiff: Michele Berry and Brian Berry
Defendant: Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Lippincott Van Lines, Southern Nevada Movers, Inc. and Macon Trading Post, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01450
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Based on the parties' stipulation [ECF No. #9 ], and it appearing that this court lacks jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is REMANDED back to the Eighth Judicial District Court, case no. A-19-796188-C, Dept. 10. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Certified copy of order and docket sheet mailed to state court - DC)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 stipulation to withdraw defendant's motion to dismiss #3 . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/12/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and Order to Remand by Defendants Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Southern Nevada Movers, Inc.. (Mills, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Ord er to Withdraw Defendants re #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Lippincott Van Lines. (Mills, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Brian Berry, Michele Berry. Replies due by 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Decl. Matt Tsai ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) (Tsai, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Berry, Michele Berry. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/3/2019.(Tsai, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Southern Nevada Movers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Mills, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Southern Nevada Movers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Vanliner Insurance Company for Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Southern Nevada Movers, Inc. added. (Mills, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc., Southern Nevada Movers, Inc.. Responses due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mills, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/20/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796188-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5672236) by Southern Nevada Movers, Inc., Lippincott Van Lines, Robert W. Lippincott, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Mills, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry et al v. Lippincott Van Lines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Lippincott, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippincott Van Lines
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nevada Movers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon Trading Post, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Berry
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Tsai
Represented By: Erik Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Berry
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Tsai
Represented By: Erik Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?