Woodburn et al v. City of Henderson
Plaintiff: Thomas Woodburn and Kelly Woodburn
Defendant: City of Henderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01488
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Strike by Plaintiffs Kelly Woodburn, Thomas Woodburn. Replies due by 10/22/2019.(Mott, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Kelly Woodburn, Thomas Woodburn. Replies due by 10/22/2019.(Mott, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #9 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #9 Motion to Strike by Plaintiffs Kelly Woodburn, Thomas Woodburn. (Mott, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Kelly Woodburn, Thomas Woodburn. (Mott, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Defendant City of Henderson. (Thomas, Ethan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant City of Henderson. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Thomas, Ethan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant City of Henderson. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Thomas, Ethan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant City of Henderson. (Thomas, Ethan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 -2 Amended Complaint. City of Henderson answer due 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kelly Woodburn, Thomas Woodburn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mott, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant City of Henderson. (Thomas, Ethan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by City of Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thomas, Ethan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/27/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/11/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-797926-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5680668) by City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint and Acceptance of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paek, Montgomery) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodburn et al v. City of Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Woodburn
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: Scott E Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Woodburn
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: Scott E Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson
Represented By: Ethan Thomas
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?