Alvarez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marisela Alvarez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01522
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/9/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Motions due by 3/27/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulated Protective Order Between Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez and Defendant Walmart Inc. by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Kuhls, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Albright, Paul)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: Removal; filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Kuhls, Timothy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand iled by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019.(Kuhls, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc. on 9/13/2019 executed by Marisela Alvarez. (Albright, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Kuhls, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc. (JM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Albright, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Albright, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required as to Proposed Summons #7 and #8 - ERROR: Summons not issued, wrong form used by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney Paul Albright advised to download and complete updated "AO 440 (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action" form refile as a separate event using "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link to corresponding proposed summons already filed. The Court will only issue summons submitted on the Courts approved form available on the Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (RFJ)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 VIEW Corrected Image #11 as to PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Albright, Paul) Modified on 9/12/2019 (RFJ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 VIEW Corrected Image #10 as to PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Albright, Paul) Modified on 9/12/2019 (RFJ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Marisela Alvarez. (Albright, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc. by Marisela Alvarez. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 12/10/2019.(Albright, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marisela Alvarez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Albright, Paul)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kuhls, Timothy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/30/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (SLD)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-797162-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5686316) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Kuhls, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Alvarez
Represented By: Paul Gregory Albright
Represented By: Farhan R Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?