Rutherford v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Darren Rutherford
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01525
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Carman, Benjamin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Carman, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Keating, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/19/2019.(Keating, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Keating, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Keating, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/3/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint)) (Carman, Benjamin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 VIEW #2 corrected image to PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court for Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-19-798810-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5686547) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint))(Carman, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 9/3/2019 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherford v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean D. Cooney
Represented By: Benjamin J Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Rutherford
Represented By: Kurtis James Millington
Represented By: Amy V Mondragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?