Motown Historical Museum, Inc. v. Reeves et al
Plaintiff: Motown Historical Museum, Inc.
Defendant: Jennifer Reeves, V Theater Group LLC, Jabara Records, LLC, Miracle Mile Shops, Jin Jin Reeves and William E. Shack, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01535
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darrick J. Hooker for Motown Historical Museum, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jackie M. Robinson for Motown Historical Museum, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Darrick J. Hooker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734519) by Plaintiff Motown Historical Museum, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jackie M. Robinson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5734505) by Plaintiff Motown Historical Museum, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Motown Historical Museum, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Olsen, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/3/2019) (MR).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Darrick J. Hooker and Jackie M. Robinson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/18/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
September 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5688359) by Motown Historical Museum, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons)(Olsen, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motown Historical Museum, Inc. v. Reeves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Theater Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabara Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Mile Shops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Jin Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Shack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motown Historical Museum, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Represented By: Darrick J. Hooker
Represented By: Jackie M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?