Godhart v. Tesla, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua J Godhart
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01541
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 32 EXHIBIT to #22 Response, #23 Response by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
October 29, 2019 Filing 31 EXHIBIT to #21 Response by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ALJ Decision, #2 Exhibit 2 - GC NRLB's Motion, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fifth Circuit Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - NLRB Docket) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #18 Motion by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tesla, Inc.'s 10-K, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 8-K) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 10-K, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 8-K) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to #24 Response to #16 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Default Judgment and Default by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
October 24, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Strike by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Sliker, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #16 Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Godhart, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #18 Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SolarCity Full Offer Packet, #2 Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
October 19, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Full Offer Packet, #2 Exhibit SEC 10-k Forms, #3 Exhibit Tesla Motors Inc. SEC 8-k Forms) (Godhart, Joshua)
October 19, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Strike #18 Motion, #15 Motion to Stay Discovery, #19 Motion to Dismiss, #16 Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Godhart, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of the local rules and Attorney Action Required to document #14 - ERROR: Document #14 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Joshua A Sliker. Attorney is advised, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) for each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. CORRECTION: Attorney Joshua A Sliker is advised to refile document #14 as Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Motion to Stay Proceedings contained in document #14 using the correct event separately, in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b), LR IC 2-2(c), LR IC 2-2(d) and FRCP 7. Document #14 terminated as filed in error pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery; filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Joshua A Sliker. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct events in accordance with the local rules. MOTION to Compel; filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua) Document #14 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 10/7/2019 (RFJ).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Tesla, Inc. answer due 10/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesla, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sliker, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence between Plaintiff and Defendant's Counsel) (Sliker, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice granting pro se Joshua Godhart CM/ECF access in case 2:19-cv-001541-JAD-VCF. See #8 Order and #9 Notice. (DKJ)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re Certificate of ECF Training by Joshua J Godhart. (JM)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #2 Summons Issued. Tesla, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (JQC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (JQC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. by Joshua J Godhart. Proof of service due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS065782)(JQC)
September 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godhart v. Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua J Godhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?