Barnett v. U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group
Plaintiff: Cory Barnett
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv01542
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Irvin, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minute Order)(Irvin, Brian)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Las Vegas Justice Court, Case Number 19A002692, by U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justice Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Irvin, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group
Represented By: Brian W. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?