Gray v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christine E. Gray
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01546
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Proof of Service of the court's orders by Christine E. Gray re #4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, #6 Order to Show Cause, #8 Order,. (Safa, Cyrus)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Court VACATES the show cause hearing that had been set for 10/24/2019. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff's counsel to serve Plaintiff herself with copies of this order, as well as the orders at Docket Nos. #4 and #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 21, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #7 Notice of Dismissal. (DKJ)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of dismissal by Christine E. Gray. (Safa, Cyrus)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court SETS a show cause hearing for 1:00 p.m. on 10/24/2019, for Plaintiff to explain why this case should not be dismissed as untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, by Plaintiff Christine E. Gray. (Safa, Cyrus)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Amended Complaint deadline: 10/16/2019. Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 and #2 . Attorney Gerald Welt is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christine E. Gray. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christine E. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine E. Gray
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?