Imrie v. Hachiman, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Imrie
Defendant: Palomino Club, LLC and Hachiman, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01556
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/8/2020. Motions due by 5/8/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. (Heisterman, Dare)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT CONCERNING REMOVAL by Defendants Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. (Heisterman, Dare)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/30/2019 in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Plaintiff must report at 9:00 a.m. and Defendants must report at 9:30 a.m. The written evaluation statements must be delivered to chambers-Room 3071-by 4:00 p.m. on 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/28/2019.(Heisterman, Dare) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. (Heisterman, Dare)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. (Heisterman, Dare)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Courtney Imrie. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Neal, Victoria)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Heisterman, Dare)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
September 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-797245-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5692664) by Hachiman, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Complaint)(Creer, Richard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imrie v. Hachiman, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomino Club, LLC
Represented By: Richard T Creer
Represented By: Dare Heisterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachiman, LLC
Represented By: Richard T Creer
Represented By: Dare Heisterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Imrie
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?