Smith et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sherrie C Davis and Alexander Smith, Jr.
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01576
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/10/2019. This action was received on* 9/9/2019* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Arizona* and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01576-GMN-EJY. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Verified Petition due by 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00640. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00640-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15206868 filed by Alexander Smith, Jr, Sherrie C Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie C Davis
Represented By: Carlos M Hernandez-Burgos
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Carlos M Hernandez-Burgos
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?