Singer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Singer
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01579
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Swanis, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT ng Issues Remaining to be Resolved and Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Swanis, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory R. Tan for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casey Shpall for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregory R. Tan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5727870) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Casey Shpall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5727867) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney Eric W. Swanis as counsel of record in this action in place and stead of Richard B. North, Jr. for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/25/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. (Swanis, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric W. Swanis on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2019. This action was received on* 9/9/2019* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Arizona* and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01579-JCM-VCF. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Verified Petition due by 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01690. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
September 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-01690-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14283071 filed by Robert Singer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Represented By: Gregory R. Tan
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Represented By: Gregory R. Tan
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Singer
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?