Cox v. Saul
Plaintiff: Latrina C. Cox
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01591
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Returned re #6 Certified Mail. (JQC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #3 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (ADR)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew McGarry for Latrina C. Cox and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Latrina C. Cox. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew R. McGarry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5715079) by Plaintiff Latrina C. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail (#7018 1130 0001 5956 7343 & # 7018 1130 0001 5956 7336) re #2 Order; #4 Summons Issued. (JQC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul re #3 Complaint. (cc: USM - JQC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul re #3 Complaint. (JQC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Latrina C. Cox. Proof of service due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JQC)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiffs Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff is permitted to maintain the action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment of any additional fees, costs, or security. This order granting in forma pauperis status does not extend to the issuance of subpoenas at government expense. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from this point forward, Plaintiff must serve upon defendant, or his attorney if he has retained one, a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the court. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Latrina C. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrina C. Cox
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Matthew R. McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?