USA v. Sayers Construction, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sayers Construction, LLC and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01602
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 5/12/2020. Motions due by 6/11/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Sayers Construction, LLC answer due 11/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Faux, Kurt)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2019.(Faux, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #4 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service of Sayers Construction re #5 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Sayers Construction by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hunt, John)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hunt, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5699003) by United States of America, for the use of Benefit of Source Helicopters, Division of Rogers Helicopters, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement Between Contractor & Subcontractor)(Hunt, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Sayers Construction, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayers Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Represented By: Willi H. Siepmann
Represented By: Jordan Ford Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Creighton Sebra
Represented By: John A. Hunt
Represented By: Bert Wuester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?