Fisher v. TheVegasPackage.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nick Fisher
Defendant: TheVegasPackage.com, Inc. and Douglas Douglas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01613
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen A Klein for Nick Fisher and approving Designation of Local Counsel Marc P Cook. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Nick Fisher. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cook, Marc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/25/2019. Re: #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition does not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Local counsel is advised to sign the Petition, and refile the Petition with the Court under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #6 by 10/9/2019. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 VIEW Corrected Image #8 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Klein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Marc P. Cook (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5713807) by Plaintiff Nick Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cook, Marc) Modified on 9/25/2019 (RFJ).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TheVegasPackage.com, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Nick Fisher. (Cook, Marc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nick Fisher. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cook, Marc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Douglas Douglas re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nick Fisher (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5701500) by TheVegasPackage.com, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cook, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. TheVegasPackage.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Fisher
Represented By: Marc P Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TheVegasPackage.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?