Han v. Du
Plaintiff: Yong Han
Defendant: Zhiyoung Du
Case Number: 2:2019cv01620
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zhiyoung Du by Yong Han. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/17/2019.(Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yong Han. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zhiyoung Du re #1 Complaint. (MR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Sergenian to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/31/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
September 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zhiyoung Du (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5702131) by Yong Han. Proof of service due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lee, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Han v. Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhiyoung Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Han
Represented By: David S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?