Deocampo v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fortunato Deocampo
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01626
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(Larsen, Kent)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time; Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #22 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. TransUnion LLC answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #23 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion, pursuant to LR 7-1(c). (no image attached) (MMM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #22 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion, pursuant to LR 7-1(c). (no image attached) (MMM)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc added. (Larsen, Kent)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc answer due 11/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bao, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Bayview Asset Management, LLC for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC added. (Bao, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/6/2019.(Bao, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Larsen, Kent)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. TransUnion LLC answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for TransUnion LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortunato Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. TransUnion LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortunato Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortunato Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc answer due 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Larsen, Kent)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortunato Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
September 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fortunato Deocampo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5703052) by Fortunato Deocampo. Proof of service due by 12/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bayview, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Summons SPS, #5 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deocampo v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Bao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortunato Deocampo
Represented By: Shaina R Plaksin
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?