Sears v. State of Nevada
Petitioner: Lamario Sears
Respondent: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2019cv01634
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent and against Petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is Denied. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Petitioner's #1 -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice as improperly commenced and a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Petitioner may not file any further documents in this closed case except for a motion seeking reconsideration of this Order or relief from the judgment entered. Any further filings or requests for relief must be presented in a new case with a new case number. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT of Payment: $5.00, receipt number NVLAS066152. (SLD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada, has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01634-RFB-DJA. (SLD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (SLD)
September 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamario Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?