Slocum v. Sunwoo
Plaintiff: Russell Lamont Slocum
Defendant: Jae Young Sunwoo
Case Number: 2:2019cv01640
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jae Young Sunwoo. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2019.(Smith, Kelly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Jae Young Sunwoo. (Smith, Kelly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jae Young Sunwoo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Kelly)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/18/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Jae Young Sunwoo. (Winner, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-793489-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5705931) by Jae Young Sunwoo. (Winner, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slocum v. Sunwoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Lamont Slocum
Represented By: Leila L. Hale
Represented By: Jolene J Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae Young Sunwoo
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?