Crawford v. Keolis Transit Services LLC
Plaintiff: Bobby Crawford
Defendant: Keolis Transit Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01641
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2020. If dispositive motions are filed, the deadline for filing the joint pretrial order will be suspended until 30 days after decision on the dispositive motions or further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to 6 Minute Order,,,,, by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lowry, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bobby Crawford that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Roy, Eric)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC ("Defendant") show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Defendant states the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000.00 because courts in this district have previously found the amount in controversy requirement satisfied by similar personal injury claims. (Pet. for Removal 2:12:24, ECF No. #1 ). However, given that Plaintiffs current and future medical bills seem to total $32,728.93, (Statement Regarding Removal 1:201:23, ECF No. #4 ), the Court is not convinced that Defendant has demonstrated by a preponderance of the evidence that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Defendant shall have until October 15, 2019, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to address the jurisdictional issues implicated by this Order, it shall have until October 15, 2019, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, discussing the issues raised herein.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DZ)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keolis Transit Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Keolis Transit America, Inc. for Keolis Transit Services LLC added. (Lowry, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-791753-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5706928) by Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Answer & Jury Demand, #4 Arbitration Exemption Petition, #5 Order on Arbitration Exemption Petition)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Keolis Transit Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit Services LLC
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Jonathan C. Pattillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Crawford
Represented By: Eric P Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?