Naiman v. Blue Raven Solar
Plaintiff: Louis Naiman
Defendant: Blue Raven Solar, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01643
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth E. Payson for Blue Raven Solar, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jeffrey A Silvestri. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Payson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeff Silvestri (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5771250) by Defendant Blue Raven Solar, LLC. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Blue Raven Solar, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Blue Raven Holdings, LLC for Blue Raven Solar, LLC added. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Blue Raven Solar, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/12/2019.(Silvestri, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan P. Misny and approving Designation of Local CounselOgonna M Brown. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian Murphy and approving Designation of Local Counsel Ogonna M Brown. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Blue Raven Solar, LLC answer due 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant's to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; Order re #8 Affidavit, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Louis Naiman. (Brown, Ogonna)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Louis Naiman. (Brown, Ogonna)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 ERROR: Filed in wrong case by Clerk's Office. Documents terminated.RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Emergency Motion for Injuctive Relief) (JQC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blue Raven Solar, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Louis Naiman. (Brown, Ogonna)
September 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ADR)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan P. Misny and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ogonna M. Brown (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5707103) by Plaintiff Louis Naiman. (Brown, Ogonna)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian K. Murphy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ogonna M. Brown (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5707081) by Plaintiff Louis Naiman. (Brown, Ogonna)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Louis Naiman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brown, Ogonna)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5706990) by Louis Naiman. Proof of service due by 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Ogonna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman v. Blue Raven Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Raven Solar, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Payson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Naiman
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Represented By: Jonathan Misny
Represented By: Brian Murphy
Represented By: Jonathan P. Misny
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?