Padron-Lopez v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marisol Padron-Lopez
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01647
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/22/2020. Motions due by 6/19/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marisol Padron-Lopez. (Miller, Danielle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marisol Padron-Lopez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Miller, Danielle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Weinerman, Deleela)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc., Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent BERMUDA for James River Insurance Company added. (Weinerman, Deleela)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796819-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5708212) by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padron-Lopez v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared G Christensen
Represented By: Lucian Greco, Jr.
Represented By: Deleela M. Ivey Weinerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Padron-Lopez
Represented By: Gina M. Corena
Represented By: Danielle Colette Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?