Elwell v. Harvey et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Elwell
Defendant: Gregory Harvey and Fedex Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01673
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re: #13 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/23/2020. Motions due by 4/22/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/30/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Phillip Elwell. (Albright, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Plaintiff Phillip Elwell. (Albright, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/4/2019. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant Harvey failed to do so. Accordingly, Defendant Harvey must file a certificate of interested parties no later than October 7, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE; filed by Fedex Freight, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Elwell. Gregory Harvey served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Albright, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Phillip Elwell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Albright, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Gregory Harvey. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/10/2019.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/25/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/10/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Fedex Freight, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fedex Freight, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation, Corporate Parent Fedex Freight, Inc. for Fedex Freight, Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County Nevada District Court, Case Number A-19-800705-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5715232) by Fedex Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elwell v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Elwell
Represented By: Paul Gregory Albright
Represented By: Farhan R Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Harvey
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?