Christophel v. IATSE Union
Plaintiff: Reverend Robert Christophel
Defendant: IATSE Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv01703
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT to #1 -2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Robert Christophel. (ADR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required. - ERROR : Document #1 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Pro Se party Robert Christophel. CORRECTION: Pro Se party is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #1 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Robert Christophel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons)(ADR) Modified on 10/1/2019 to restrict access to Attachment #1 per LR IC 6-1 (ADR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADR).
September 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christophel v. IATSE Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IATSE Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverend Robert Christophel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?